HI HCR89 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, McDermott, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Kong, Lowen, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Oshiro, Saiki excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, McDermott, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Kong, Lowen, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Oshiro, Saiki excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development And Tourism To Conduct A Study Analyzing The Impacts Of Retail On Hawaii's Economy, With A Focus On The Purchase Of Goods Through The Internet.
Title
Requesting DBEDT To Analyze the Impacts of Internet Retail on Hawaii's Economy
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, McDermott, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Kong, Lowen, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Oshiro, Saiki excused (6). |
2016-03-28 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1350-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-17 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2016-03-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Thursday, 03-17-16 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2016-03-11 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2016-03-10 | House | Offered |
2016-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR51 (Same As) 2016-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, McDermott, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Kong, Lowen, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Oshiro, Saiki excused (6).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=89&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HCR89_.HTM |