HI HR10 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR10
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Endorsing And Adopting, And Urging The Several Counties To Endorse And Use, The United Nations Seventeen Sustainable Development Goals As Components Of A Framework For Addressing And Assessing Hawaii's Efforts Toward Social Justice And Sustainability.
Title
Endorsing And Adopting, And Urging The Several Counties To Endorse And Use, The United Nations Seventeen Sustainable Development Goals As Components Of A Framework For Addressing And Assessing Hawaii's Efforts Toward Social Justice And Sustainability.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from EDB/VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1635-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Ito, Tokioka, Ward. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Matsumoto. |
2018-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB/VMI on Wednesday, 03-21-18 10:26AM in conference room 309. |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to EDB/VMI, FIN, referral sheet 18 |
2018-01-26 | House | Offered |
2018-01-24 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR13 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HR10 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - Referred to VMI, referral sheet 14
HR10 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - Referred to VMI, referral sheet 14
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=10&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HR10_.HTM |