HI HR108 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Working Group To Review And Update The Relevant Chapters Of The Hawaii Revised Statutes That Relate To Mental Health And Involuntary Transport, Examination, Hospitalization, And Treatment, Including Assisted Community Treatment.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Working Group To Review And Update The Relevant Chapters Of The Hawaii Revised Statutes That Relate To Mental Health And Involuntary Transport, Examination, Hospitalization, And Treatment, Including Assisted Community Treatment.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2023-03-29 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1665) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2023-03-23 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-21 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-23-23 10:40AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-23-23 9:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to HLT, referral sheet 20 |
2023-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR101 (Same As) 2023-04-20 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 923) in amended form (SD 1).