HI HR111 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Transportation To Make The Necessary Accommodations To Allow The Eastbound Shoulder Lanes From The Makakilo Drive On-ramp To The Kunia Off-ramp On The H-1 Freeway During Peak Morning Traffic Hours To Assist In Alleviating Traffic Congestion.
Title
Department of Transportation; Shoulder Lane; Leeward Coast
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-01 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey excused (1). |
2013-04-01 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1310), recommending adoption. |
2013-03-25 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-25-13 11:15AM in conference room 309. |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to TRN, referral sheet 39 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR141 (Same As) 2013-04-09 - Referred to TIA.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=111&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HR111_.HTM |