HI HR112 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of The Attorney General To Review Confidentiality Laws Pertaining To Court Involved, Multi-agency Youth.
Title
Confidentiality Laws; Court Involved, Multi-Agency Youth; Department of the Attorney General; Study
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Carroll, Chong, M. Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1610), recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-07 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Coffman, Herkes, Luke, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Ito, McKelvey, B. Oshiro. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 04-07-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-04 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no and Carroll, M. Oshiro, Takai, Tokioka excused. | |
2011-04-04 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1321), recommending referral to JUD. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Belatti, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 03-28-11 9:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 39 | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Offered | |
2011-03-14 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR132 (Same As) 2011-04-18 - (S) Referred to JDL.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=112 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HR112_.HTM |