HI HR133 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing The Cultural, Educational, Political, And Economic Relations Between The People Of Hawaii And Istanbul, Turkey.
Title
Istanbul, Turkey; Sister State
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Oshiro excused (2). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Reported from INT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1691-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) The committees on INT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Awana, Hashem, Choy, Evans, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McKelvey. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by INT on Monday, 04-02-12 10:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Referred to INT, referral sheet 50 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR173 (Same As) 2012-04-13 - (S) Referred to TIA.