HI HR14 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR14
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Review Of The Efficacy Of The Technology Resources Of The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Review Of The Efficacy Of The Technology Resources Of The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1250) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2021-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 03-23-21 10:00AM in conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 15 |
2021-01-25 | House | Offered |
2021-01-22 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR14 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
HCR14 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
HCR14 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).