HI HR142 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR142
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Financial And Performance Assessment Of The Managed-care Organizations That Administer The State's Medicaid Program.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Financial And Performance Assessment Of The Managed-care Organizations That Administer The State's Medicaid Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR142 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 27
HR142 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 25
SCR116 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to HMS, WAM.
HR142 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 25
SCR116 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to HMS, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=142&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HR142_.HTM |