HI HR156 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Tobacco Quitline To Make Permanently Visible On Each Page Of Its Website Information Pertaining To The Availability Of Interpretation Services Upon Request.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Tobacco Quitline To Make Permanently Visible On Each Page Of Its Website Information Pertaining To The Availability Of Interpretation Services Upon Request.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2023-04-03 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Nishimoto excused (3). |
2023-04-03 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1893) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2023-03-29 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela, Martinez. |
2023-03-23 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LGO on Wednesday, 03-29-23 10:00AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to LGO, referral sheet 20 |
2023-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR155 (Same As) 2023-04-04 - Referred to HHS.