HI HR169 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-02 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on ERB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Saiki, Ward, Wooley excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-02 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on ERB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Saiki, Ward, Wooley excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The President Of The United States, Chairperson Of The Joint Chiefs Of Staff, Secretary Of Defense, Hawaii Congressional Delegation, Governor, And Chamber Of Commerce Of Hawaii Military Affairs Council, To Do Everything Within Their Power And Influence To Retain Military And Defense-related Civilian Jobs In Hawaii.
Title
Department of Defense; Job Retention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-02 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on ERB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Saiki, Ward, Wooley excused (4). | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Reported from PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1425-12), recommending referral to ERB. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, Souki, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Takai, Takumi. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 03-29-12 10:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Referred to PBM, ERB, referral sheet 50 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR218 (Same As) 2012-04-02 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on ERB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Saiki, Ward, Wooley excused (4).