HI HR185 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR185
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Strongly Urging The United States Department Of The Interior And The United States Congress To Provide Additional Federal Aid And Support To The State Of Hawaii For Financial, Medical, And Other Federal Assistance For Migrants Covered By The Compact Of Free Association.
Title
Strongly Urging The United States Department Of The Interior And The United States Congress To Provide Additional Federal Aid And Support To The State Of Hawaii For Financial, Medical, And Other Federal Assistance For Migrants Covered By The Compact Of Free Association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1894), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-22 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 03-22-19 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR185 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HCR206 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HCR206 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=185&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HR185_.HTM |