HI HR206 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources And Department Of Parks And Recreation Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Collaboratively Work With Community Stakeholders To Identify And Establish Off-leash Dog Parks On The Windward Side Of Oahu.
Title
Encouraging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources And Department Of Parks And Recreation Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Collaboratively Work With Community Stakeholders To Identify And Establish Off-leash Dog Parks On The Windward Side Of Oahu.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1807-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308. |
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1587-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-23 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Kong, Lowen, McKelvey, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, C. Lee. |
2018-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-23-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR238 (Same As) 2018-04-10 - Referred to WTL/PSM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=206&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HR206_.HTM |