HI HR21 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs To Identify The Scope Of Native Hawaiian Cultural Appropriateness For The Purpose Of Addressing Native Hawaiian Disparities.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs To Identify The Scope Of Native Hawaiian Cultural Appropriateness For The Purpose Of Addressing Native Hawaiian Disparities.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1716-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ilagan, Souza. |
2024-03-28 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 17 |
2024-03-05 | House | Offered |
2024-03-04 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR32 (Same As) 2024-04-17 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=21&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HR21_.HTM |