HI HR64 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Board Of Education, In Partnership With The State Public Charter School Commission, To Submit A Report On Increasing Access To Stable, Suitable, And Affordable Facilities For Public Charter Schools.
Title
Requesting The Board Of Education, In Partnership With The State Public Charter School Commission, To Submit A Report On Increasing Access To Stable, Suitable, And Affordable Facilities For Public Charter Schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Darius Kila [D] | Rep. Trish La Chica [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Jenna Takenouchi [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1679-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto, Ward. |
2024-03-28 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:15PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Woodson excused (3). |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1374-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-03-21 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Quinlan, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Matayoshi, Todd. |
2024-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-21-24 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 18 |
2024-03-07 | House | Offered |
2024-03-06 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR79 (Same As) 2024-04-05 - Referred to EDU.