HI HR72 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR72
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The City And County Of Honolulu To Rename West Loch Community Shoreline Park In Ewa Beach, Oahu, To Kapapapuhi Point Park.
Title
Requesting The City And County Of Honolulu To Rename West Loch Community Shoreline Park In Ewa Beach, Oahu, To Kapapapuhi Point Park.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2017-04-05 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1638) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2017-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan, Ward. |
2017-03-31 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-04-17 10:30AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2017-03-10 | House | Offered |
2017-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR72 (Carry Over) 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.