HI HR92 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The City And County Of Honolulu To Provide Real Property Taxpayers Who Pay For Their Own Trash Collection Services A Property Tax Reduction, Tax Credit, Or Alternate Method Of Compensation Or Reimbursement.
Title
Requesting the City and County of Honolulu to provide a property tax reduction, or tax credit, or some other method of compensation to county real property taxpayers who pay for their own trash collection services.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2015-04-09 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1431), recommending adoption. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-04-02 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR154 (Same As) 2015-04-14 - Referred to PSM, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=92&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HR92_.HTM |