HI HR99 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR99
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Referred to EEP/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Referred to EEP/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Regional Cesspool Modernization Task Force Within Each County Of The State.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Regional Cesspool Modernization Task Force Within Each County Of The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to EEP/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR119 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HR99 (Carry Over) 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR111 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HR99 (Carry Over) 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR111 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=99&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HR99_.HTM |