HI SB1006 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds definitions of "caregiver" and "safe home" to the Child Protective Act. Clarifies that local customs of caring for children outside the family home by relatives and friends are, where appropriate, available alternatives to the department of human services and the court assuming custody of children.
Title
Child Welfare Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JGO. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 134) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JGO. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-09 1:45 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to HMS, JGO. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |