HI SB1062 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - (S) Act 129, 5/21/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 587).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - (S) Act 129, 5/21/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 587).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires professional employer organizations to register with the director of labor and industrial relations. Specifies requirements for registration. Requires bond. Effective upon approval; provided that the new registration requirements shall take effect July 1, 2011. (CD1)
Title
Professional Employer Organization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-21 | (S) Act 129, 5/21/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 587). | |
2010-05-21 | (H) Act 129, on 5/21/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 345). | |
2010-05-03 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 21 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 2 No(es): Senator(s) Slom, Takamine. 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 105-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 105-10). | |
2010-04-23 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, McKelvey, Herkes, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-10 2:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-10 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-04-16 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-19-10 3:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-04-14 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-15-10 3:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) Re-referred to LAB/EBM, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 65 | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Rhoads, McKelvey, Herkes, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Pine. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 496). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 494). | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Ige, Hemmings. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 330). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Hanohano, M. Oshiro, Ward excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1205-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Awana, Sagum. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-29-10 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) Re-referred to LAB/EBM, FIN, referral sheet 52 | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Berg, Keith-Agaran, Manahan, Takumi, Thielen excused (5). | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Reported from LAB/EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 712-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2010-03-09 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Berg, Evans, Manahan, Takai, Tsuji, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Wakai, Wooley. | |
2010-03-09 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Saiki, Takumi, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Souki. | |
2010-03-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/EBM on Tuesday, 03-09-10 10:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to LAB/EBM, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 34) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2393) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green, Sakamoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-24-10 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-10 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-03 | (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-03-09 9:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-25-09 8:30 AM in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |