HI SB1097 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants 10-year license for 1 stand-alone casino in Waikiki not in a hotel. Establishes Hawaii gaming control commission. Imposes 6.75 per cent wagering tax on gross receipts. Creates state gaming fund and compulsive gambler program. Appropriates $5,000,000 to establish the gaming commission and its operations. Appropriation to be reimbursed by the casino licensee.
Title
Stand-Alone Casino Gaming; Waikiki; Appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1097 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB1097_.HTM |