HI SB118 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB118
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-04 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-04 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals exemptions provided to certain special funds from the requirement that all special funds pay a pro rata share of administrative expenses incurred by the department responsible for the operations supported by the special fund.
Title
Relating To The State Budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments And Be Recommitted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-04 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to WAM. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2072) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to WAM. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Misalucha, Shimabukuro. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-03-22 10:55AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB118 (Carry Over) 2021-01-22 - Referred to WAM.