HI SB1211 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Act 016, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1117).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Act 016, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1117).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the requirement that a vehicle protection product warrantor and a service contract provider submit to the Insurance Commissioner a copy of each warranty or service contract form proposed for use in the State.
Title
Relating To Forms Submitted To The Insurance Commissioner.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Act 016, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1117). |
2019-04-24 | House | Act 016, on 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1117). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 538). |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1979), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3). |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1400), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Belatti. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 23). |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 764) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Nishihara. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB985 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1211&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1211_.HTM |