HI SB1244 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1244
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes system access and system integration requirements for the computer software tracking system for medical cannabis dispensaries. Requires the department of health to submit an annual report to the legislature on data captured using the computer software tracking system.
Title
Relating To Medical Cannabis Dispensaries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to LBT/HHS, CPN/WAM. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to LBT/HHS, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB696 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1244 (Carry Over) 2023-02-03 - Re-Referred to LBT/HHS, CPN/WAM.
SB1244 (Carry Over) 2023-02-03 - Re-Referred to LBT/HHS, CPN/WAM.
Subjects
Access Requirements
Computer Software Tracking System
Medical Cannabis Dispensaries
Reporting Requirements
System Integration Requirements
Computer Software Tracking System
Medical Cannabis Dispensaries
Reporting Requirements
System Integration Requirements
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1244&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1244_.HTM |