HI SB1268 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Act 068, 06/07/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1168).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Act 068, 06/07/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1168).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes technical changes to the statutory definitions of "agricultural enterprise lands" and "non-agricultural park lands" for clarification and consistency purposes. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Agricultural Lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Senate | Act 068, 06/07/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1168). |
2023-06-07 | House | Act 068, on 06/07/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1168). |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 997). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 05-04-23. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 05-04-23. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-04-23 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Elefante, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-23 9:22AM; Conference Room 325. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-23 11:10AM; Conference Room 325. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 838). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Gates, Tarnas Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2023-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Elefante Co-Chair; Richards. |
2023-04-04 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 557). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 568). |
2023-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-31 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-03-23. |
2023-03-31 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1861) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-29 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ilagan. |
2023-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1). |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1413) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-03-17 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2023-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-17-23 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 401) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 842) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 253) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to AEN, JDC. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB970 (Same As) 2023-03-10 - Referred to AEN, JDC.