HI SB1304 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1304
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Native Hawaiian health advisory council in the office of health equity to provide guidance to the governor and legislature on issues that impact Native Hawaiians and their communities. Requires the council to establish, update, and maintain a directory or registry of Native Hawaiian professionals and leaders for governor-appointed positions. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Native Hawaiians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 394) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kim. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 02-09-17 2:55PM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 1:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HWN/IAA, WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1304 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.