HI SB1310 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the sunset date on the use of new safe harbor agreements, habitat conservation plans, and incidental take licenses as recovery options for conserving and protecting the State's threatened and endangered species.
Title
Threatened and Endangered Species
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure. | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-03-11 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Reported from ENE/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 409) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH deferred the measure until 02-15-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-15-11 3:10PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-11 4:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to ENE/WLH, JDL. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1083 (Same As) 2011-03-10 - (S) Referred to WLH/JDL, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1310 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB1310_.htm |