HI SB1333 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1333
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 1:30PM; CR 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 1:30PM; CR 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the Uniform Controlled Substances Act to be consistent with amendments in the federal controlled substances law. Exempts hemp from the Uniform Controlled Substances Act. Removes cannabidiol drugs that have been approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration from the list of Schedule V substances and certain provisions of the Hawaii Penal Code. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To The Uniform Controlled Substances Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 1:30PM; CR 329. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Johanson Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2021-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 491). |
2021-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-07 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-09-21. |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1656) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-04-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Har; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2021-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-01-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1475) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to JHA, CPC, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 411) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 650) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-17-21 10:00AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 146) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1333 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 1:30PM; CR 329.
HB542 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
HB542 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.