HI SB1388 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1388
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies the methods by which the Department of Land and Natural Resources can issue new ocean recreation commercial permits and renew existing ocean recreation commercial permits. Specifies that new permits for ocean recreation management areas and facilities where a permit limit is implemented, new permits will be issued by the method enumerated and in the order set forth herein until the limit is reached. For renewal of existing permits in ocean recreation management areas and facilities where a permit limit is implemented, the ability to renew a commercial permit will be based on seniority until the limit is reached.
Title
Relating To Ocean Recreation Commercial Permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-06 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-23 1:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1388&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1388_.HTM |