HI SB1417 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Act 121, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1223).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Act 121, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1223).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for burial grants for qualifying Filipino-American World War II veterans to provide funeral and burial services and transportation of their remains to the Philippines, subject to certain conditions. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Filipino Veterans Burial Assistance.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Senate | Act 121, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1223). |
2019-06-25 | House | Act 121, on 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1223). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 117) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 117). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Cullen, Aquino; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 2:00PM in conference room 016. |
2019-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-19 2:00PM in conference room 016. |
2019-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 2:00PM in conference room 016. |
2019-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901). |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, Cullen Co-Chairs; Aquino, McDermott. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 792). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2158) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto. |
2019-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3). |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1428), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-13 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:30AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 478) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1114) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 344) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB378 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.