HI SB1443 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1443
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of education to stock bronchodilators for emergency use during respiratory distress and authorize department employees to volunteer to administer bronchodilators.
Title
Relating To Asthma.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Tim Richards [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee on HHS deferred the measure. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 3:45PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HHS, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1443 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
HB1448 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB1448 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1443&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1443_.HTM |