HI SB1456 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Electricity Reliability Council to develop and implement grid reliability and interconnection standards.
Title
Renewable Energy; Hawaii Electricity Reliability Council; Reliability and Interconnection Standards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-09-11 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-08-11 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to CPN/ENE, WAM. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1456 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB1456_.HTM |