HI SB146 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-11 - (H) Act 203, on 7/8/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-11 - (H) Act 203, on 7/8/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the energy resources coordinator to conduct a study and issue a preliminary and final report on the conditions and policies necessary to expand biofuel production in the State to displace a significant amount of petroleum-based liquid fuel. Report to 2012 and 2013 legislature. (CD1)
Title
Biofuel; Feasibility Study; Energy Resources Coordinator
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-11 | (H) Act 203, on 7/8/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307). | |
2011-07-11 | (S) Act 203, 7/8/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307). | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 135) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-29 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 135). | |
2011-04-29 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, M. Oshiro, Chong, Ito, Kawakami, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Souki. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Ige; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 3:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 3:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-11 3:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-11 3:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 649). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; English, Ige, Co-Chair(s); . | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Coffman, Souki, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Chong, Ito, Kawakami, Thielen. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Re-referred to EEP, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 60 | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 424). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Hanohano, Har, Marumoto, Wooley voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cullen, Yamane voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1538) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Yamashita, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-11 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1154) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Chang, Herkes, Ito, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Chong, Har. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-22-11 at 9:00 AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 91) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from ENE/TIA/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 551) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kouchi, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz, Kahele, Kim, Tokuda, Wakai. | |
2011-03-02 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2011-03-02 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Gabbard, Kouchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kahele. | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/TIA/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-02-11 1:15PM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-23 | (S) Re-Referred to ENE/TIA/WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to ENE/TIA, WAM. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |