HI SB1558 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-11 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-11 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the counties to enact ordinances to establish special purpose overlay districts for the purpose of urban renewal; Establishes an urban renewal task force to investigate urban renewal needs and to propose solutions on the state and county levels; makes appropriation.
Title
Urban Renewal; Counties; Task Force; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-11 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) Reported from WLH/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 98) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 3:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to WLH/PGM, WAM. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1558 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB1558_.HTM |