HI SB1580 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1580
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establish certain minimum staff-to-patient ratios for hospitals, care homes, and dialysis facilities. Requires hospitals to create hospital staffing committees and staffing plans. Establishes certain meal break, rest break, and overtime provisions applicable to health care personnel at hospitals, care homes, and dialysis facilities. Appropriates moneys to the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations for implementation and enforcement.
Title
Relating To Labor Standards At Health Care Facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Senate | The committee on HHS deferred the measure. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS deferred the measure until 02-15-23 1:00PM; CR 225. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee on LBT deferred the measure. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS/LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 3:10PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to HHS/LBT, CPN/WAM. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to HHS/LBT, WAM. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1580 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
HB1378 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB1378 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Appropriations ($)
Care Homes
Dialysis Facilities
DLIR
Health
Hospitals
Nurse Aides
Nurses
Staffing
Work Environment
Care Homes
Dialysis Facilities
DLIR
Health
Hospitals
Nurse Aides
Nurses
Staffing
Work Environment
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1580&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB1580_.HTM |