HI SB192 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurance policies and contracts to provide coverage for the cost of hearing aid devices in their base plans. (SD1)
Title
Hearing Aid Devices; Health Insurance Coverage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 409) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2009-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-11-09 2:40 pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-09 3:00pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to HTH, CPN. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |