HI SB20 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-15 - (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 21
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-15 - (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 21
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the director of finance to report to the legislature the reasons for any material change to a capital improvement project for which the legislature has already appropriated funds. Defines "material change." (SD1)
Title
Modifications to Legislative Appropriations; Reporting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 21 | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-02-14 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 16) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (English). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 02-14-11. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-02-11 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 111) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-09-11 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Introduced. |