HI SB2038 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes, until June 30, 2021, boards to exclude the public from the meeting locations where board members are physically present if the board meetings are held by interactive conference technology during a state of emergency due to a contagious illness. Permits two or more members of a board to attend state of the city, state of the county, state of the State, or state of the judiciary addresses. Requires meetings held by interactive conference technology to recess, rather than terminate, when audio communication cannot be maintained and may reconvene only when audio communication is reestablished. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Board Members.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2). |
2020-06-25 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1228-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-06-24 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2020-06-23 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 06-24-20 3:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-06-23 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 06-24-20 3:05PM in conference room 325. |
2020-06-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 06-24-20 3:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-16-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Monday, 03-16-20 at 2:00 PM. |
2020-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-12-20 2:31PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 93) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2993) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-20 10:45AM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2424) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |