HI SB2061 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits bidders and their subcontractors who are registered under an apprenticeship agreement with DLIR to benefit from a 5% reduction in their bid amount on contracts for $250,000 or more. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Procurement; Apprenticeable Trade, Subcontractor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-24-10 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-10 10:10AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Reported from LBR/JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2098) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Gabbard. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Hee. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR/JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-10 9:30am in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Referred to LBR/JGO, WAM. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2430 (Same As) 2010-02-04 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.