HI SB2082 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Act 092, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1193).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Act 092, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1193).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the fee schedule in section 501-218, HRS, is not intended to be a comprehensive schedule of all fees payable under chapter 501, HRS. Authorizes additional land court fees to be established by court or administrative rule. (CD1)
Title
Judiciary Package; Land Court; Fees
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | Act 092, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1193). |
2014-06-18 | House | Act 092, on 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1193). |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-30 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-24 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14. |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 17-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 17-14). |
2014-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Rhoads, Lowen, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Say. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Hee, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 2:20PM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-14 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-16-14 1:35PM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Solomon Chair; Hee, Dela Cruz Co-Chairs; Galuteria, Slom Members. |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Evans, Rhoads, Lowen Co-Chairs; Har, Say, Matsumoto Members. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 535). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1600-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2014-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-31-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-21 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1171-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-03-18 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Wooley. |
2014-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-18-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Awana, Fale, Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2014-03-13 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 929-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-03-10 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, C. Lee, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fale; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Kawakami, Say, Thielen. |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-10-14 8:45AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 100) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2643) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from WTL/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2390) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Ihara, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Dela Cruz, Taniguchi. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Galuteria. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/JDL has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-07-14 1:45PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-14 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Referred to WTL/JDL, WAM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1636 (Same As) 2014-02-11 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2).