HI SB2084 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies acceptable procedure for initiating criminal complaints.
Title
Relating To Criminal Complaints.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1541 (Same As) 2022-03-28 - Act 002, 03/28/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1102).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2084&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2084_.HTM |