HI HB1541 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Act 002, 03/28/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1102).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Act 002, 03/28/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1102).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies acceptable procedure for initiating criminal complaints.
Title
Relating To Criminal Complaints.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Act 002, 03/28/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1102). |
2022-03-28 | House | Act 002, on 03/28/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1102). |
2022-03-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-03-21 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 543). |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, San Buenaventura . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kanuha). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-21-22. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3243) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 116). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Todd excused (3). |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 798-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-02-01 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2022-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-01-22 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2084 (Same As) 2022-01-21 - Referred to JDC.