HI SB2108 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a condominium association that claims a Renewable Energy Technologies Income Tax Credit under section 235-12.5, HRS, to transfer the credit, or a portion thereof, to another individual or corporate taxpayer that is not related to the condominium association. Requires the Director of the Department of Taxation to prepare forms necessary for the transfer of Renewable Energy Technologies Income Tax Credits. Provides that condominium association unit owners shall not be entitled to any apportionment or distribution of a transferred Renewable Energy Technologies Income Tax Credit when a condominium association transfers the tax credit. Takes effect 7/1/2040. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy Tax Credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2371) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |