HI SB2139 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes provisions regarding the fees and other costs charged to reproduce certain government documents during a nationally declared disaster. Requires the Office of Information Practices to adopt certain rules regarding the fees and other charges that may be imposed for searching, reviewing, or segregating disclosable records during a nationally declared disaster. Takes effect 7/1/2112. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Public Records.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2703) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Wakai. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-08-24 3:03PM; CR 225. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 3:10PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC/WAM. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1610 (Same As) 2024-02-07 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.