HI SB2146 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the planning special fund for the operations of the office of planning, including personnel costs. Effective 7/1/50. (SD1)
Title
Office of Planning; Special Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Reported from WTL/EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2169) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Bunda, Takamine, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Fukunaga, Kokubun. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Ige; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Slom. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-10 1:15pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Referred to WTL/EDT, WAM. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |