HI SB2169 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Addresses the auditor's recommendations regarding the transfer of non-general funds to the general fund.
Title
Non-General Funds; Auditor's Recommendations; Auditor Package
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 91). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) One Day Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2525) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-29-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2026 (Same As) 2012-01-19 - (H) Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 3