HI SB2267 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation for the construction of micro apartment housing units. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD1)
Title
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation; Appropriation; Micro Apartment Housing Units ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-03-14 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 03-17-14 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 139) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2724) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-05-14 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2031) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 01-27-14 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-25-14 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. |