HI SB2299 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a creative media task force to develop legislation to encourage and enable the development of projects and businesses in the motion picture, television, recording, digital media, and related industries. (SD1)
Title
Creative Media Task Force
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2186) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Ige. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-03-10 1:30pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-10 1:15pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |