HI SB2299 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a ten per cent state earned income tax credit. Requires reporting by department of taxation. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2016.
Title
Taxation; State Earned Income Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-29-16 1:25PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-23-16 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-17-16 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-16 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2299&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2299_.HTM |