HI SB23 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB23
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals vehicle license recovery fees. Takes effect 1/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicle Rental Industry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 140) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Inouye). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 906) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Inouye; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 302) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Inouye; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS, CPN/WAM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPN . |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB23 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22