HI SB2335 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the membership, authority, and duties of the State Building Code Council. Gives the counties the sole discretion to amend, adopt, and update the Hawaii state building codes as they apply within each county's respective jurisdiction.
Title
Relating To The State Building Code Council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-15-24 4:00PM; Conference Room 225. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 4:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2335&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2335_.HTM |